EP0884530 - A supply valve for a fuel burning appliance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kigass Electronics Ltd 36 Crossgate Road, Park Farm Industrial Estate Redditch Worcestershire B98 7SN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states Kigass Electronics Ltd 36 Crossgate Road, Park Farm Industrial Estate Redditch, Worcestershire B98 7SN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chuter, Barry Ian 36 Lodge Drive, Dibden Purlieu Southampton, SO4 5LX / GB | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304554.3 | 09.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | GB19970012451 | 13.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9712451 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884530 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/00 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
F23N1/005 (EP);
F23N2235/14 (EP);
F23N2235/16 (EP);
F23N2235/18 (EP);
F23N2237/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/34] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zuführventil für einen Brenner | [1998/51] | English: | A supply valve for a fuel burning appliance | [1998/51] | French: | Soupape d'alimentation pour un brûleur | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/20] | 18.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.08.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS6325412 ; | [XA]NL8102571 (NEOM BV) [X] 1-6,16-18 * figure - * [A] 7,11; | [XA]JPS61159028 ; | [XA]JPS5835320 ; | [PX]EP0818655 (GAGGENAU HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-6,11,12,16-18 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880629), vol. 012, no. 229, Database accession no. (M - 714), & JP63025412 A 19880202 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1-6,8-10,12,16-18 * abstract * [A] 7 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861206), vol. 010, no. 365, Database accession no. (M - 542), & JP61159028 A 19860718 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8-10,12-18 * abstract * [A] 7 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830520), vol. 007, no. 116, Database accession no. (M - 216), & JP58035320 A 19830302 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1-6,16-18 * abstract * [A] 7,11 |