EP0884718 - Electroluminescence apparatus and driving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuribayashi, Masaki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Yuichi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Senoo, Akihiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ueno, Kazunori Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tsuzuki, Hidetoshi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304560.0 | 09.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | JP19970153669 | 11.06.1997 Original published format: JP 15366997 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884718 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/30, H05B33/08 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
G09G3/3208 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0256 (EP,US);
G09G2310/06 (EP,US);
G09G2320/043 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1999/34] |
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrolumineszente Anzeigevorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [1998/51] | English: | Electroluminescence apparatus and driving method thereof | [1998/51] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent et son procédé de commande | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 21.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/48] | 25.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0295477 (GTE PROD CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,16,18 * column 5, line 10 - column 12, line 7; figures 1-10 * [Y] 7-12,17-24; | [Y]GB2097166 (LOHJA AB OY) [Y] 7-12,17-24 * page 1, line 6 - page 2, line 94; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4823121 (SAKAMOTO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,5,6,14,15,26 * column 1, line 19 - column 8, line 32; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]JPH0841452 ; | [A]US5416494 (YOKOTA MINORU [JP], et al); | [A]US4888523 (SHOJI KAZUO [JP], et al) | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, & JP08041452 A 19960213 (CANON INC) [DA] 4,13,25 * abstract * |