EP0887114 - Nozzle cleaning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.04.2005 [2005/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, OH 44145-1119 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 28601 Clemens Road Westlake, Ohio 44145-1119 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waryu, Joseph C. 916 Princeton Avenue Amherst, Ohio 44001 / US | 02 /
Loparo, Thomas A. 755 Idlewood Avenue Sheffield Lake, Ohio 44054 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304636.8 | 11.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970877079 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: US 877079 | US19980015171 | 29.01.1998 Original published format: US 15171 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887114 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887114 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887114 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B05B15/00, B05B15/02 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B05B1/3006 (EP,US);
B05B15/555 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reinigungssystem für Düse | [1999/01] | English: | Nozzle cleaning system | [1999/01] | French: | Système de nettoyage de buse | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 21.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4979677 (DANKERT MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 25 - line 46; figure - *; | [AD]US5344073 (WARYU JOSEPH C [US], et al) [AD] 1,6-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0562888 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 17, line 25 - column 18, line 23; figure - *; | [A]US3876144 (MADDEN RAYMOND FRANCIS, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 4, line 3 - line 27; figure - *; | [A]CH390742 (AUTOMATION INDUSTRIELLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,3 * page 1, line 36 - line 41; figure . *; | [A]US4013225 (DAVIS J C) [A] 1,5 * column 5, line 46 - line 66; figure - *; | [A]US2098487 (EDWARD COOPER, et al) [A] 5 * page 1, column R, line 8 - line 39; figure - * | by applicant | JPS6242688 | US5344073 | US5078325 |