EP0892334 - Cabinet security state detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard, Massachusetts 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Thomas Joseph 95 Melendy Road Milford, New Hampshire 03055 / US | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304657.4 | 12.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | US19970892138 | 14.07.1997 Original published format: US 892138 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0892334 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0892334 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892334 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
G06F21/86 (EP,US);
G08B15/00 (KR);
G06F1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/20] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Erfassen des Sicherheitgrads eines Gehäuses | [1999/03] | English: | Cabinet security state detection | [1999/03] | French: | Détection du degré de sécurité d'un boîtier | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 09.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2300743 (DERITEND ELECTRO MECHANICAL SE [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,11 * page 5, line 12 - line 32 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 15; figures 6,7 *; | [A]US5317304 (CHOI ALEXANDER K [US]) [A] 1,2,6-8,12,13 * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 25; figures 4,5,7B *; | [A]EP0558222 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 9, line 51 - column 10, line 4; figures 4-6 * |