EP0889414 - Input/output bus system in a tower building block system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard, Massachusetts 01754 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amberg, Mark Frederick 7677 Penssylvania Drive Littleton, Colorado 80122 / US | 02 /
Nemeth, Frank Michael 942 Skyway Boulevard Colorado Springs, Colorado 80906 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304658.2 | 12.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970884777 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 884777 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889414 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G06F13/409 (EP,US);
H05K1/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Eingang-/Ausgangbussystem in einem Modularen Turmrechnersystem | [1999/01] | English: | Input/output bus system in a tower building block system | [1999/01] | French: | Système de bus d entrées /sorties dans un système de tour d ordinateur modulaire | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/32] | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |