07.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
23.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
04.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
12.08.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] |
22.07.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
13.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
06.05.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2005 [2005/25] |
29.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |
20.08.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
17.08.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.08.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.12.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.12.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.01.2004 [2004/05] |
27.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.04.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.06.2003 [2003/23] |
14.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.11.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
30.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
14.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.02.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.11.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
29.09.2000 |
First examination report |
|
26.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.09.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] |
14.06.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.01.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] |
07.01.2000 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.02.2000 [2000/08] |
30.04.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] |
18.12.1998 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] |
27.11.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] |