blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0971142

EP0971142 - Flexible shaft coupling element, flexible couplings incorporating same and method for forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gates Corporation
900 South Broadway
Denver, Colorado 80209 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
THE GATES CORPORATION
900 South Broadway
Denver, Colorado 80209 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Clarke, Arthur Jack
Leys of Barnsoul, Irongray
Dumfriesshire, Scotland DG2 9SQ / GB
02 / Whitfield, Kevin John Francis
The Limes, Beattock Road, Moffat
Dumfriesshire, Scotland DG10 9SD / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Carpmael, John William Maurice
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London, WC1A 2RA / GB
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98304804.217.06.1998
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971142
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1998
ClassificationIPC:F16D3/74
[2000/02]
CPC:
F16D3/74 (EP,US); F16D1/06 (KR); F16D3/54 (EP);
F16D2200/006 (EP,US); F16D3/725 (EP); Y10S464/903 (EP,US)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Elastisches Wellenkupplungselement, dieses enthaltende elastische Kupplungen und Verfahren zur Hestellung desselben[2000/02]
English:Flexible shaft coupling element, flexible couplings incorporating same and method for forming same[2000/02]
French:Elément d'accouplement flexible d'arbres, accouplements flexibles l'incorporant et méthode pour sa fabrication[2000/02]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/15]
02.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS6372940  ;
 [X]US2867103  (WILLIAMS WILLIAM A) [X] 1,2,11,12 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 68; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR1203905  (FORGES ET CHAUDRONNERIES DU NO) [A] 1,2* page 1, column 2, line 29 - page 2, column 1, line 19; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]GB879493  (US RUBBER CO) [X] 1,6,11,12 * page 1, line 69 - page 2, line 110; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]GB893521  (FALK CORP) [X] 1,3-6,11,12 * page 2, line 20 - line 59; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0280175  (NITTA KK [JP]) [A] 13 * column 5, line 10 - column 7, line 49; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]DE9308521U  (TOMA, JOHANN ERWIN) [X] 1,3-5,11,12 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 14; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US5378202  (SWINDERMAN R TODD [US]) [A] 9,10 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 10; figures 2,3 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880812), vol. 012, no. 296, Database accession no. (M - 731), & JP63072940 A 19880402 (BANDO CHEM IND LTD) [X] 13 * abstract *
by applicantUS2859599
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.