EP0891871 - Print Cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Toshiyuki 94-350 Aza Oosaki, Takizawa, Takizawa-mura Iwate-gun, Iwate-ken / JP | 02 /
Kiuchi, Hidenori 50-2 Aza Kamiimoda, Imoda, Tamayama-mura Iwate-gun, Iwate-ken / JP | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Kensett, John Hinton Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304815.8 | 18.06.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | JP19970189596 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: JP 18959697 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0891871 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0891871 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | [1999/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0891871 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J17/32, B41J11/58 | [1999/38] | CPC: |
B41J17/32 (EP,KR,US);
B41J3/36 (KR);
B41J32/02 (KR);
B41J35/28 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1999/03] | B41J17/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/21] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckkassette | [1999/03] | English: | Print Cartridge | [1999/03] | French: | Cassette d'impression | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 23.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.03.2004 | GB | 18.06.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/46] | GB | 18.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0203665 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 1 - column 8, line 17 * * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 11 * * column 15, line 18 - column 16, line 25 * * columns 1-9 * [A] 3,4; | [XA]US5277502 (KIM JAE S [KR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 36 * * figures 5-10 * [A] 2-4; | [X]JPS63242669 ; | [X]JPS63128963 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890125), vol. 13, no. 33, Database accession no. (M - 789)<3381> , & JP63242669 A 19881007 (Y. SHIMIZU) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881007), vol. 12, no. 376, Database accession no. (M - 750)<3223> , & JP63128963 A 19880601 (H. SASAKI) [X] 1 * abstract * | Examination | GB2301066 |