EP0887706 - Resist composition containing specific cross-linking agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD 1-2 Doshomachi-3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD 1-2 Doshomachi-3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD 1-2 Doshomachi-3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states WAKO PURE CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD 1-2 Doshomachi-3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 1-1, Saiwai-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumino, Motoshige Tokyo Kenkyusho, Wako Pure Chem. Ind. Ltd. 1633, Oaza Matoba, Kawagoe-shi / JP | 02 /
Fujie, Hirotoshi Tokyo Kenkyusho, Wako Pure Chem. Ind. Ltd. 1633, Oaza Matoba, Kawagoe-shi / JP | 03 /
Katsuyama, Akiko c/o Matsushita Elec. Corp., 1-1, Saiwaicho Takatsuki-shi / JP | 04 /
Endo, Masayuki 13-30, Kurodoricho 1-chome Izumi-shi, Osaka / JP | [1999/08] |
Former [1999/01] | 01 /
Sumino, Motoshige Tokyo Kenkyusho, Wako Pure Chem. Ind. Ltd. 1633, Oaza Matoba, Kawagoe-shi / JP | ||
02 /
Fujie, Hirotoshi Tokyo Kenkyusho, Wako Pure Chem. Ind. Ltd. 1633, Oaza Matoba, Kawagoe-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Katsuyama, Akiko c/o Matsushita Elec. Corp., 1-1, Saiwaicho Takatsuki-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Endo, Masayuki c/o Matsushita Elec. Corp., 1-1, Saiwaicho Takatsuki-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | Baillie, Iain Cameron Langner Parry, 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304859.6 | 19.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | JP19970184365 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: JP 18436597 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887706 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0382 (KR);
C09K19/542 (KR);
G03F7/0045 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0046 (KR);
G03F7/0397 (KR);
G03F7/095 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | Spezifisches Vernetzungsmittel enthaltende Resistzusammensetzung | [1999/01] | English: | Resist composition containing specific cross-linking agent | [1999/01] | French: | Composition pour photoréserve contenant un agent réticulant spécifique | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 17.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 05.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB832565 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [X] 6-8,10-12 * page 3; example 2 *; | [X]US3264230 (PROOPS WILLIAM R) [X] 6-8,10-12 * column 15, Epoxide F *; | [X]US4291114 (BERGGREN WILLIAM R, et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * column 17 - column 18; examples 5-9; table 2 *; | [X]EP0262414 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [X] 6,7 * page 6, line 16 - line 50 ** page 31; example 10 *; | [X]EP0509512 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6-11 * page 4, line 1 - line 11 * * page 5, line 55 - line 58 * * page 8; example 7; table 1 *; | [X]EP0605361 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 9, line 13 * * page 11; example 6 * |