EP0887316 - Utility of water-soluble polymers having pendant derivatized amide functionalities for scale control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states NALCO CHEMICAL COMPANY One Nalco Center Naperville Illinois 60563-1198 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Phillip W. 120 Richard Road Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | 02 /
Morris, John D. 14104 Sound Hemingway Circle Plainfield, Illinois 60544 / US | 03 /
Reed, Peter E. 2280 North Weller Drive Plainfield, Illinois 60544 / US | 04 /
Tang, Jiansheng 2139 Schumacher Lane Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | 05 /
Wang, Jin-shan 256 Greystone Lane Rochester, New York 14618 / US | 06 /
Young, Paul R. 915 N. Scott Wheaton, Illinois 60187 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304984.2 | 24.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970884154 | 27.06.1997 Original published format: US 884154 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887316 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C02F5/12 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
C08F20/58 (EP,US);
C02F5/08 (KR);
C02F5/12 (EP,US);
C02F5/125 (EP,US);
C04B35/6344 (EP);
C04B35/63444 (EP,US);
C02F2303/08 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung für Kesselsteinkontrolle von wasserlöslichen Polymeren mit hängenden derivatisierten Amidgruppen | [1999/01] | English: | Utility of water-soluble polymers having pendant derivatized amide functionalities for scale control | [1999/01] | French: | Utilisation pour contrôler le tartre de polymères hydrosolubles à fonctions pendantes dérivées des amides | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/44] | 25.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0206814 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-5,9-15,22 * claims 1-14 * |