EP0887194 - Ink-jet recording apparatus, ink-jet recording method, image processing apparatus for processing image data, and method of outputting data from a host apparatus connected to an ink-jet recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/36] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Minako Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nagoshi, Shigeyasu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kato, Masao Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305020.4 | 25.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | JP19970170279 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: JP 17027997 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887194 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887194 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887194 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/485, B41J2/01, B41J2/05, B41J2/21 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
B41J2/2114 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | B41J2/485, B41J2/01, B41J2/05 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/30] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsapparat, Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren zur Verarbeitung von Bilddaten und Verfahren zur Ausgabe von Daten aus einer mit einem Tintenstrahldruckapparat verbundene Host-Vorrichtung | [1999/01] | English: | Ink-jet recording apparatus, ink-jet recording method, image processing apparatus for processing image data, and method of outputting data from a host apparatus connected to an ink-jet recording apparatus | [1999/01] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, procédé d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, appareil de traitement d'image pour traiter des données d'images et procédé de sortie de données d'un appareil hôte connecté à un appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 03.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Request for further processing for: | 26.03.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 26.03.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 05.09.2007 | ES | 16.12.2007 | FR | 02.05.2008 | [2008/44] |
Former [2008/24] | NL | 05.09.2007 | |
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | ES | 16.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4686538 (KOUZATO YASUO [JP]) [A] 1,8-10,19,28 * figures 3,8 *; | [A]EP0517544 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,8-10,19,28,31-33 * figures 16,23-25 * * page 14, line 35 - page 15, line 16 *; | [A]US5196942 (SHIAU JENG-NAN [US]) [A] 1,8-10,19,28* figure 12 *; | [XA]EP0726157 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 31,33 * figures 9-32 * * page 8, line 45 - page 9, line 33 * * page 10, line 4 * [A] 1,8-10,19,28,32; | [XA]EP0726159 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 31,33 * figures 7A,7B,9 * * page 11, line 17 - line 43 * [A] 1,8-10,19,28,32; | [PXA]EP0788885 (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 31,33 * figures 4A-D,7 * * page 5, line 49 - page 6, line 9 * * page 5, line 31 - line 35 * [A] 1,8-10,19,28,32 | by applicant | JPS58128862 | JPH0852867 | JPH09226154 |