EP0889511 - Trench contact process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard Melbourne Florida 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Quin 208 Cherokee Drive Blacksburg, Virginia / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305023.8 | 25.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970885879 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 885879 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889511 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889511 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L21/331, H01L29/78, H01L29/739 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,US);
H01L21/76 (KR);
H01L29/66348 (EP,US);
H01L29/66727 (EP,US);
H01L29/7396 (EP,US);
H01L29/7397 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/50] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Graben-Kontakt-Verfahren | [1999/01] | English: | Trench contact process | [1999/01] | French: | Procédé de contact en tranchée | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 30.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/48] | 25.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2005 | Observations by third parties | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/37] | 18.04.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4853345 (HIMELICK JAMES M [US]) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]DE4300806 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 2-4 * figures 1-8 * [A] 1; | [XA]US5366914 (TAKAHASHI NOBUMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 2-4 * figures 3,4 * [A] 1; | [A]WO9630947 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [A] 1* figure 6 *; | [XY]EP0747967 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [US]) [X] 2-5 * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 54; figures 3,4 * [Y] 1 | other | JPS63224260 | US4879254 | WO9747045 | - MATSUMOTO S. ET AL, "ULTRALOW SPECIFIC ON RESISTANCE UMOSFET WITH TRENCH CONTACTS FOR SOURCE AND BODY REGIONS REALISED BY SELFALIGNED PROCESS", (19910829), vol. 27, no. 18, pages 1640 - 1642, XP000264480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19911025 |