EP0889616 - Data acquisition device and method for synchronizing with a host [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, NJ 08830 / US | [2002/48] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. 186 Wood Avenue South Iselin, New Jersey 08830 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gigandet, Scott 291 Center Street Groveland, MA / US | 02 /
Sullivan, John F. 53 Blossom Lane Groton, MA / US | 03 /
Addiss, Robert 3 Rose Lane Westford, MA / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Litchfield, Laura Marie, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305125.1 | 29.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970884857 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 884857 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0889616 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889616 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/02, H03L7/099 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H03L7/0993 (EP,US);
A61B5/0002 (EP,US);
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
H04L7/0083 (EP,US);
H04L7/0331 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1999/41] |
Former [1999/37] | AT, DK, FR, GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Messwerterfassungsgerät und Methode zur Aufsynchronisation auf einen Zentralrechner | [1999/01] | English: | Data acquisition device and method for synchronizing with a host | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif de saisie de donnéés mesurées et méthode synchronisation avec l'ordinateur central | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 08.07.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4523322 (ABBIATE JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1,12 * column 2, line 54 - column 11, line 5 *; | [X]US5517521 (STRAWN DAVID F [US]) [X] 1,3,8,9,12,17,18 * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 45 *; | [A]WO9718639 (VITALCOM INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9723047 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] * page 7, line 1 - page 13, line 5 * |