EP0892416 - Method of making a push rod for a switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyodenso Kabushiki Kaisha 10-4, Shinbashi 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states TOYODENSO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-4, Shinbashi 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Keiji, c/o Toyodenso Kabushiki Kaisha Tsurugashima Kojo, 1000, Ootagaya Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama / JP | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [1999/03] | Application number, filing date | 98305293.7 | 03.07.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | JP19970180158 | 04.07.1997 Original published format: JP 18015897 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892416 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0892416 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01H11/06 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
H01H11/06 (EP,US);
H01H13/12 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49204 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4922 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49224 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/39] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Druckstabes für einen Schalter | [1999/03] | English: | Method of making a push rod for a switch | [1999/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une barre de pression pour un commutateur | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 03.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.07.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4021405 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4197636 (OSANAI AKIRA [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 53 - line 65; figures 3-7 * |