EP0895316 - Lever-type connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osawa, Hiroki, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie, 510 / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, 4, Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2QP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305349.7 | 06.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970204896 | 30.07.1997 Original published format: JP 20489697 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895316 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895316 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/629 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
H01R13/62938 (EP,US);
H01R13/4538 (EP);
H01R13/62955 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/41] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hebelartiger Steckverbinder | [1999/05] | English: | Lever-type connector | [1999/05] | French: | Connecteur du type à levier | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0532366 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,7,8,10,11 * column 6, line 51 - column 8, line 29; figure 1 *; | [D]JPH0574517 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) |