EP0892393 - Laminated thin film disk for longitudinal recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2000 [2000/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bian, Xiaoping 292 Tradewinds Drive, No. 4 San Jose, California 95123 / US | 02 /
Doerner, Mary Frances 148 Forest Avenue Santa Cruz, California 95062 / US | 03 /
Mirzamaani, Mohammad Taghi 782 Lodgewood Court San Jose, California 95120 / US | [1999/03] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/03] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305551.8 | 13.07.1998 | [1999/03] | Priority number, date | US19970892724 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: US 892724 | [1999/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0892393 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/66 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
G11B5/676 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/716 (KR);
G11B5/7379 (KR);
G11B5/851 (KR);
G11B2220/2508 (KR);
Y10S428/90 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/39] |
Former [1999/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dünnfilmlaminierte Platte zur longitudinalen Aufzeichnung | [1999/03] | English: | Laminated thin film disk for longitudinal recording | [1999/03] | French: | Disques stratifiée à couches minces pour enregistrement magnétique | [1999/03] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/16] | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.08.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.08.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.08.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0778327 ; | [X]EP0704839 (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 14 - line 24 * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 4 * * column 5, line 3 - line 24 * * column 7, line 27 - line 54 * * column 8, line 23 - line 52 *; | [AD] - LEE L -L ET AL, "SEED LAYER INDUCED (002) CRYSTALLOGRAPHIC TEXTURE IN NIAL UNDERLAYERS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (19960415), vol. 79, no. 8, PART 02A, pages 4902 - 4904, XP000695643 [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.361644 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 095, no. 006, & JP07078327 A 19950320 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract * |