blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970653

EP0970653 - Hose connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd.
Units B-F, 24th Floor, CDW Building, 388 Castle Peak Road Tsuen Wan
New Territories, Hong Kong / CN
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Techtronic Industries Co., Ltd.
Units B-F, 24th Floor, CDW Building, 388 Castle Peak Road
Tsuen Wan, New Territories / HK
Inventor(s)01 / Breit, Oliver Rudolf, 6th Floor, Flat 2
Yuen Fu Building, 99C Dock Street, Whampoa
Estate, Hung Hom, Kowloon, Hong Kong / HK
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date98305799.321.07.1998
[2000/02]
Priority number, dateUS1998010531826.06.1998         Original published format: US 105318
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970653
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A47L9/24, A47L9/02, F16L19/065, F16L19/02
[2000/02]
CPC:
F16L19/0218 (EP); A47L9/02 (EP); A47L9/242 (EP);
F16L19/065 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL [2000/38]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schlauchverbindung[2000/02]
English:Hose connector[2000/02]
French:Raccord pour tuyaux flexibles[2000/02]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/15]
02.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/15]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US3986737  (KRUSCHE KURT) [Y] 1,2 * figure - *;
 [Y]US4537424  (MAIER SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2 * figure 2 *;
 [A]DE2850422  (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1,2 * figure . *;
 [A]FR1423894  (MARTIN MOULET & CIE) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]GB742110  (SAMUEL BOOTH & COMPANY LTD) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]GB360587  (EDMUND BROWNBILL) [A] 1 * figures 1,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.