Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002058308 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81741401 | 26.03.2001 | US22980499 | 13.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5866368 | 02.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US91745697 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6210674 | 03.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5363997 | 24.07.1997 | US91745697 | 22.08.1997 | US22980499 | 13.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11137277 | Global Dossier | 25.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US5363997 | 24.07.1997 | US91745697 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0893502 | Global Dossier | 27.01.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US5363997 | 24.07.1997 | US91745697 | 22.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2238658 | 24.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5363997 | 24.07.1997 | US91745697 | 22.08.1997 |