EP0897164 - Voice dialing system for preventing unauthorized use of a call forwarding feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/07] | Apparatus and methods for user identification to deny access or service to unauthorized users | ||
[2009/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | ||
Former [1999/07] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergl, Vladimir Vyhledske nam.635 165 00 Praha No. 6 / CZ | 02 /
Davies, Kenneth 17 Mohawk Road Ossining, NY 10562 / US | 03 /
Ittycheriah, Abraham Poovakunnel 37 Jupiter Ridge Drive Danbury, CT 06811 / US | 04 /
Maes, Stephane Herman 1 Wintergreen Hill Road Danbury, Connecticut 06811 / US | [1999/07] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/07] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305894.2 | 23.07.1998 | [1999/07] | Priority number, date | US19970908121 | 11.08.1997 Original published format: US 908121 | [1999/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0897164 | Date: | 17.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0897164 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0897164 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, H04M3/54, H04M3/38 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
H04M3/382 (EP,US);
G07C9/37 (EP,US);
H04M3/42204 (EP,US);
H04M2201/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/07] | G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [2001/43] |
Former [1999/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sprachgesteuertes Wählsystem zum Verhindern des unberechtigten Gebrauchs einer Anrufumleitungsfunktion | [2009/41] | English: | Voice dialing system for preventing unauthorized use of a call forwarding feature | [2009/33] | French: | Système de numérotation à commande vocal interdisant l'usage non-autorisé de la fonction de renvoi d'appel | [2009/33] |
Former [1999/07] | Gerät und Verfahren zur Benutzeridentifikation, um Zugang oder Dienstleistung an nicht autorisierte Benutzer zu verweigern | ||
Former [1999/07] | Apparatus and methods for user identification to deny access or service to unauthorized users | ||
Former [1999/07] | Appareil et procédés d'identification d'utilisateurs pour refuser l'accès ou un service aux utilisateurs non autorisés | Examination procedure | 22.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | IE | 23.07.2010 | [2011/35] |
Former [2011/28] | IT | 03.03.2010 | |
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 03.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0750413 (INTELLPROP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * column 9, line 9 - line 24 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 3 *; | [Y]WO9518441 (AT & T CORP [US]) [Y] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * page 8, line 29 - page 11, line 25 *; | [Y]US5499288 (HUNT ALAN K [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 25 * * column 8, line 7 - line 49 *; | [A]US5625671 (SALIN HANNU-PEKKA [FI]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 58 *; | [A]EP0581689 (SMART INGENIERIE [FR]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 22 - column 6, line 30 *; | [A]US5249230 (MIHM JR THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1,5,7 * abstract * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 49 *; | [A]US5465290 (HAMPTON THOMAS H [US], et al) | [Y] - CLARK D W, "WHERE YOU GO, SO GO THE CALLS", AT & T TECHNOLOGY,US,AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH CO. SHORT HILLS, NEW JERSEY, (19930921), vol. 8, no. 3, ISSN 0889-8979, page 6,8, XP000420492 [Y] 5,6 * the whole document * | [A] - FEDERICO A ET AL, "A new automated method for reliable speakers identification and verification over telephone channels", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 2976959, XP002154888 [A] 3,6 * abstract * | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS: ICASSP 87. 1987 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (CAT. NO.87CH2396-0), DALLAS, TX, USA, 6-9 APRIL 1987, 1987, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 1457 - 1460 vol.3 |