EP0903691 - Print driver for a color printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2012/12] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | ||
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states CANON BUSINESS MACHINES, Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Akitoshi Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 02 /
Hirabayashi, Hiromitsu Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 03 /
Masumoto, Kazuyuki Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 04 /
Aichi, Takao Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 05 /
Sukigara, Akihiko Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 06 /
Kawanabe, Tetsuya Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 07 /
Kamada, Masahi Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | 08 /
Hirata, Osamu Canon Business Machines Inc. 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | [2012/12] |
Former [1999/12] | 01 /
Yamada, Akitoshi Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | ||
02 /
Hirabayashi, Hiromitsu Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | |||
03 /
Masumoto, Kazuyuki Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | |||
04 /
Aichi, Takao Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | |||
05 /
Sukigara, Akihiko Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | |||
06 /
Kawanabe, Tetsuya Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | |||
07 /
Kamada, Masahi Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | |||
08 /
Hirata, Osamu Canon Business Machines Inc., 3191 Red Hill Avenue Costa Mesa, California 92626 / US | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/12] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/12] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305967.6 | 27.07.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | US19970901719 | 28.07.1997 Original published format: US 901719 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0903691 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0903691 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903691 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/60, G06K15/10, B41J2/21 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
G06K15/10 (EP,US);
G06K15/1848 (EP,US);
G06K15/186 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0094 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/12] | G06T1/60 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/07] |
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckertreiber für einen Farbdrucker | [1999/12] | English: | Print driver for a color printer | [1999/12] | French: | Driver d'imprimante pour imprimante couleur | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 06.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2003 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Request for further processing for: | 14.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2006 | Decision despatched | 11.11.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2005 | Decision despatched | 19.02.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 19.02.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.03.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.03.2012 | NL | 21.03.2012 | ES | 02.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/22] | IT | 21.03.2012 | |
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
ES | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | IT | 21.03.2012 | |
NL | 21.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | NL | 21.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0871139 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-5,23,24,29-33,51,52,57-68,86,87,92-103,121-132,137,144 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 29 * * column 10, lines 19-28; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US5581295 (PROWAK JAMES R [US]) [X] 1,23,29,51,57,64,86,92,99,121,128,137,144 * abstract * * column 5, lines 35-39 * * column 10, lines 34-36; figure 3C *; | [A]JPS60139473 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851130), vol. 009, no. 303, Database accession no. (M - 434), & JP60139473 A 19850724 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1,23,29,51,57,64,86,92,99,121,128,137,144 * abstract * | Examination | EP0574199 | EP0713191 |