18.02.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
22.10.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.08.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
23.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.09.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
13.09.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
09.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.09.2002 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
30.08.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
20.08.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
28.06.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
15.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.01.2002 |
First examination report |
|
08.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.10.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
18.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.08.2001 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
10.11.2000 |
Change - designated states |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
21.10.2000 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.12.2000 [2000/49] |
06.10.2000 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.11.2000 [2000/47] |
18.09.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
09.08.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.07.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] |
07.07.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] |
05.07.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
12.11.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
18.12.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] |