Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11142838 | Global Dossier | 28.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US5429297 | 31.07.1997 | US11065298 | 07.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0895116 | Global Dossier | 29.12.1999 | A3 | EP0895116 | 03.02.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US5429297 | 31.07.1997 | US11065298 | 07.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1154868C | 23.06.2004 | C | CN1224177 | 28.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US5429297 | 31.07.1997 | US11065298 | 07.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR19990014296 | 25.02.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US5429297 | 31.07.1997 | US11065298 | 07.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG87003 | 19.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5429297 | 31.07.1997 | US11065298 | 07.07.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6204901 | 20.03.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5429297 | 31.07.1997 | US11065298 | 07.07.1998 |