EP0895116 - Liquid crystal color shutters using reflective polarizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University Durham North Carolina 27710 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | For all designated states DUKE UNIVERSITY Durham, North Carolina 27710 / US | ||
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states Compaq Computer Corporation 20555 S.H. 249 Houston Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knox, Richard M. 5231 Norbonne Lane Houston, Texas 7769 / US | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98305983.3 | 28.07.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | US19970054292P | 31.07.1997 Original published format: US 54292 P | US19980110652 | 07.07.1998 Original published format: US 110652 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895116 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895116 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1347, G02F1/1335 | [1999/05] | CPC: |
G02F1/13473 (EP,US);
G21K1/04 (KR);
H04N5/74 (KR);
G02F1/133536 (EP,US);
G02F1/133545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/52] |
Former [2000/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | ||
Former [2000/36] | GB | ||
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 27.06.2000 | LT | 27.06.2000 | LV | 27.06.2000 | RO | 27.06.2000 | SI | 27.06.2000 | Title | German: | Farbselektive Flüssigkristall-Lichtventile mit reflektierenden Polarizatoren | [1999/05] | English: | Liquid crystal color shutters using reflective polarizer | [1999/05] | French: | Obturateurs chromatiques à cristaux liquides | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 11.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/14] | Request for further processing for: | 29.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.09.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2001 | 31.07.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5548422 (CONNER ARLIE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-21,24-38 * column 8, line 32 - column 16, line 25; figure 1 * * column 11, line 36 - line 42 * * column 20, line 05 - line 08 * [Y] 3,22,23; | [A]WO9402879 (UNIV COLORADO FOUNDATION [US]) [A] 1-38 * page 8, line 19 - page 10, line 33; figure 2 *; | [D]US5243455 (JOHNSON KRISTINA M [US], et al); | [X]US5325218 (WILLETT STEPHEN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 24 - column 2, line 53 *; | [A]WO9517692 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 8, line 17 - line 23 * * page 13, line 05 - line 36 * | [Y] - "REFLECTIVE POLARIZERS WITH PROJECTION DISPLAYS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 0018-8689, page 43, XP000694510 [Y] 3,22,23 * the whole document * |