Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0897986
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.09.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] |
17.05.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
12.02.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.07.2001 |
First examination report |
|
27.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.04.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
26.01.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |
19.01.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] |
11.09.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.05.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
16.07.1999 |
Correction of patent application |
published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] |
01.04.1999 |
Change - inventor |
published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] |
08.01.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] |