blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0898417

EP0898417 - A method for multiple color space color transformation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Creo IL. Ltd.
3 Hamada Street
Herzlia 46103 / IL
[2002/24]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
CreoScitex Corporation Ltd.
3 Hamada Street
Herzlia 46103 / IL
Former [1999/08]For all designated states
Scitex Corporation Ltd.
7 Hamada Street
Herzliya 46104 / IL
Inventor(s)01 / Melman, Haim Zvi
3 Hagai Street
Kfar Saba 44335 / IL
02 / Keydar, Moshe
109/7 Histradrut Street
Holon 58347 / IL
[1999/08]
Representative(s)Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al
Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/08]Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al
Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane
London, WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date98306646.519.08.1998
[1999/08]
Priority number, dateIL1997012157919.08.1997         Original published format: IL 12157997
[1999/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0898417
Date:24.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0898417
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/60
[1999/08]
CPC:
H04N1/6058 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/08]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Mehrfarbraum-Farbtransformation[1999/08]
English:A method for multiple color space color transformation[1999/08]
French:Procédé de transformation de couleurs pour espace de couleurs multiples[1999/08]
Examination procedure29.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
18.10.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0494034  (IBM [US]) [A] 1* column A *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.