blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0899647

EP0899647 - Remote security technology [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Compaq Computer Corporation
20555 S.H. 249 Houston
Texas 77070 / US
[2008/15]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
Compaq Computer Corporation
20555 S.H. 249
Houston Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Angelo, Michael F.
14926 Amber Forest Drive
Houston, Texas 77068 / US
02 / Olarig, Sompong P.
15415 Evergreen Knoll Lane
Cypress, Texas 77429 / US
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98306651.519.08.1998
[1999/09]
Priority number, dateUS1997092709629.08.1997         Original published format: US 927096
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0899647
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0899647
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0899647
Date:09.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:G06F21/00
[2007/46]
CPC:
G08B13/1418 (EP,US); G06F21/31 (EP,US); G06F21/575 (EP,US);
G06F2211/1097 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1999/09]G06F1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ferngesteuerte Sicherheitstechnologie[1999/09]
English:Remote security technology[1999/09]
French:Technologie de sécurité à distance[1999/09]
Examination procedure11.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
08.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2008Fee for grant paid
21.02.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5046082  (ZICKER ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,12,15-17,19 * column 1, line 17 - line 35 * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 59 * [Y] 3,9,10,13,14,18,20-22;
 [Y]EP0449242  (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [Y] 3,9,10,13,14,18,20-22 * abstract * * page 3, line 43 - page 4, line 46 * * page 11, line 52 - page 12, line 1 *;
 [A]US5418537  (BIRD DAVID G [US]) [A] 8,15,19* column A; figure 4 *;
 [PX]EP0836131  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [PX] 1,2,5,6,14,17 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 23 *;
 [PX]US5748084  (ISIKOFF JEREMY M [US]) [PX] 1,2,4-7,12,14,16-18 * column A; figures 3,4 * * column 1, line 48 - column 4, line 61 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.