EP0907126 - Automatic configuration of primary and secondary peripheral devices for a computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taugher, Lawrence N. 291 Newell Road Loveland, CO 80537 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1999/14] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306752.1 | 24.08.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | US19970928879 | 12.09.1997 Original published format: US 928879 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907126 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907126 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/4411 (EP,US);
G06F13/4072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/51] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Konfiguration von Primär- und Sekundärperipheriegeräte für einen Rechner | [1999/14] | English: | Automatic configuration of primary and secondary peripheral devices for a computer | [1999/14] | French: | Configuration automatique de dispositifs périphériques primaires et secondaires pour un ordinateur | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 18.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5247682 (KONDOU YOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 32; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0629098 (LOGICA UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 7, column 12, line 53 - page 8, column 13, line 49 *; | [A]US5649233 (CHEN ZHI-HSIEN [TW]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 15 - column 6, line 48 * | [A] - LÉVY-ABÉGNOLI, "Plug and Play: Une Philosophie de Conception des PC", ELECTRONIQUE., PARIS FR, (199404), no. 37, pages 36 - 39, XP000443460 [A] 1-6 * page 37, column L, paragraph 1 - page 39, column M, paragraph 3; figure - * | Examination | - "Retrofitting Plug-and-Play Capability into Legacy Cards", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (199610), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 96 - 97 | - HALFHILL TOM R., "Transforming the PC: Plug and Play", BYTE, PETERBOROUGH, NH, US, (199409), no. 9, pages 78 - 94 |