EP0899823 - Strain relief apparatus for use in a communication plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CommScope Solutions Properties, LLC 1285 Southern Way Sparks, NV 89431 / US | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states Commscope Solutions Properties, LLC 1285 Southern Way Sparks, NV 89431 / US | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chapman, James Stephen 4526 South 150th Street Omaha, NE 68137 / US | 02 /
Chavez, Carlos Francisco 2123 North One Hundred-First Street Omaha, NE 68134 / US | 03 /
Ensz, Lyndon Dee 727 South 152 Circle Omaha, NE 68154 / US | 04 /
Garibay, Carlos 8354 E. Hampton Circle Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | 05 /
Reichard, George Willis, Jr. 1206 Hillcrest Dr. Carmel, IN 46033 / US | [1999/12] |
Former [1999/09] | 01 /
Chapman, James Stephen 14715 Weir Street Omaha, NE 68137 / US | ||
02 /
Chavez, Carlos Francisco 2123 North One Hundred-First Street Omaha, NE 68134 / US | |||
03 /
Ensz, Lyndon Dee 727 South 152 Circle Omaha, NE 68154 / US | |||
04 /
Garibay, Carlos 8354 E. Hampton Circle Indianapolis, IN 46256 / US | |||
05 /
Reichard, George Willis, Jr. 1206 Hillcrest Dr. Carmel, IN 46033 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1999/09] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98306770.3 | 25.08.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | US19970922621 | 03.09.1997 Original published format: US 922621 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899823 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899823 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899823 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/58 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
H01R13/5829 (EP,US);
H01R24/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/09] | H01R13/58, H01R23/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/32] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zugentlastungsvorrichtung für Nachrichtenstecker | [1999/09] | English: | Strain relief apparatus for use in a communication plug | [1999/09] | French: | Dispositif de soulagement de contraintes pour connecteur de communication | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0434256 (AMP INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 29 - column 11, line 21; figures 1-34 *; | [A]GB1558811 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1,6-11 * page 4, line 97 - page 5, line 116; figures 1-14 *; | [A]US4054350 (HARDESTY EDWIN CHARLES) [A] 1,6-11 * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 35; figures 2-7 *; | [A]EP0716477 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 2 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 53; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US5334044 (FALOSSI ALDO [US], et al) [A] 12 * column 4, line 10 - line 13; figure 3 * |