EP0899689 - CT imaging method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/09] | Ct imaging method and x-ray ct apparatus | ||
[1999/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Yokogawa Medical Systems Ltd. 7-127 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states GE Yokogawa Medical Systems Ltd. 7-127 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagiwara, Akira 7-127 Asahigaoka 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-8503 / JP | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. Essex House 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307014.5 | 01.09.1998 | [1999/09] | Priority number, date | JP19970235566 | 01.09.1997 Original published format: JP 23556697 | [1999/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0899689 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0899689 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | [2001/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899689 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
G06T11/006 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (KR);
A61B6/4435 (KR);
A61B6/5205 (KR);
G06T11/005 (KR);
G06T2211/428 (EP,US);
Y10S378/901 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/29] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bilderzeugung eines Röntgenbildes mittels Computertomograf | [1999/09] | English: | CT imaging method and apparatus | [2002/33] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la production d'une image par tomographe computérisé | [2002/33] |
Former [1999/09] | Ct imaging method and x-ray ct apparatus | ||
Former [1999/09] | Procédé et appareil pour la production d'une image rayon X par tomographe computérisé | Examination procedure | 24.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5406479 (HARMAN JONATHAN W [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 50 *; | [A]WO9604614 (ARCH DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract ** page 5, line 11 - page 16, line 16 *; | [A]US5566341 (ROBERSON GEORGE P [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 27 *; | [A]US5594766 (TAM KWOK C [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 3 - line 39 * |