blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0901827

EP0901827 - Ball and socket closure for specimen collection container [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/51]For all designated states
Becton Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
One Becton Drive
Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417-1880 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Niermann, Volker
196B Main Street
Little Falls, NJ 07424 / US
02 / Carano, Don
5 Kennedy Drive
Flanders, NJ 07836 / US
03 / Savitz, Steve
1300 Alicia Avenue
Teaneck, NJ 07666 / US
04 / Birkland, Katherine
44 Nimitz Road
Wayne, NJ 07470 / US
05 / Gottlieb, Robert
1 Surrey Lane
Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US
[1999/11]
Representative(s)Nash, David Allan, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Nash, David Allan, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Former [2000/27]Nash, David Allan, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [1999/11]Jones, Michael Raymond, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98307062.402.09.1998
[1999/11]
Priority number, dateUS1997092806412.09.1997         Original published format: US 928064
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0901827
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0901827
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0901827
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:B01L3/14, B65D47/30, F16K5/20
[2004/50]
CPC:
B01L3/50825 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/03]B01L3/14, B65D47/30, F16K5/20, // A61B5/14
Former IPC [1999/11]B01L3/14, // A61B5/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [1999/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kugelgelenkverschluss für Probenaufnahmebehälter[1999/11]
English:Ball and socket closure for specimen collection container[1999/11]
French:Fermeture à rotule pour récipient de collection d'échantillons[1999/11]
Examination procedure13.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/19]
20.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
27.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
23.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2004Fee for grant paid
25.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
16.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]FR2630402  (MOULAGE AUTOMATIQUE SA [FR]) [X] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 8; figure - * * page 6, line 8 - line 23 * [Y] 25;
 [Y]US2577725  (DRAKE ROBERT W) [Y] 25 * column 2, line 32 - line 53; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0622623  (ISCO INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 5-7 *;
 [A]US4632140  (HARDING BRUCE L [US]) [A] 1,24 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 8 * * column 3, line 28 - line 44; figure 1 *;
 [A]US3782608  (SCHNEIDER U) [A] 24 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 3; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE9016568U  (WELLA AG) [A] 25 * page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * * page 5, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]DE2219009  (ERICHSON FA HERBERT) [A] 1,25 * page 4, paragraph 2; figure - *;
 [PA]WO9803410  (IRONWOOD IND INC [US]) [PA] 1-25 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5618026  (GEYER CRAIG [US]) [A] 1,24 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 24 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.