EP0901752 - Herbicidal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-0053 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-0053 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukada, Noriyuki, Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-0053 / JP | 02 /
Kitajima, Toshio, Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-0053 / JP | 03 /
Koyanagi, Shinichiro, Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Tokuyama-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-0053 / JP | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307102.8 | 03.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | JP19970238710 | 03.09.1997 Original published format: JP 23871097 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0901752 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0901752 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/18, A01N37/20, A01N37/22, A01N43/10, A01N43/36, A01N43/40 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N37/18 (EP,US);
A01N37/20 (EP,US);
A01N37/22 (EP,US);
A01N43/10 (EP,US);
A01N43/36 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N37/18, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N37/22, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/10, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/36, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/40, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/76, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/76, A01N43/40, A01N43/36, A01N43/10, A01N43/08, A01N37/38, A01N37/34, A01N37/22, A01N37/20, A01N37/18 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N43/40, A01N43/36, A01N43/10, A01N43/08, A01N37/38, A01N37/34, A01N37/22, A01N37/20, A01N37/18 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1999/48] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herbizide Zusammensetzung | [1999/11] | English: | Herbicidal composition | [1999/11] | French: | Composition herbicide | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0009091 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 4 - line 9 * * page 15, table *; | [Y]FR2448857 (NITROKEMIA IPARTELEPEK [HU]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 25 * * table I * * tables VIII-IX *; | [Y]EP0031042 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 6 - page 5, line 3 *; | [D]JPS5699481 (BASF AG); | [Y]EP0065724 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, line 6 - page 5, line 2 *; | [Y]US4600433 (ALT GERHARD H [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 51 * * examples 1-56 * * column 17, line 36 - line 40 *; | [Y]US4622061 (ALT GERHARD H [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 25 * * examples 1-44 * * column 14, line 39 - line 43 *; | [A]EP0206251 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK [JP]); | [Y]EP0229649 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 9 *; | [D]JPH0515699 (TOSHIBA CORP) |