EP0902603 - Strip heating coil apparatus with series power supplies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDUCTOTHERM CORP. 10 Indel Avenue Rancocas New Jersey 08073-0157 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states INDUCTOTHERM CORP. 10 Indel Avenue Rancocas, New Jersey 08073-0157 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loveless, Don L. 34527 Sandpebble Drive Sterling Heights, Michigan 48310 / US | 02 /
Lovens, Jean Avenue Reine Astrid 12 4831 Limbourg / BE | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | Perkins, Sarah Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307324.8 | 10.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | US19970928774 | 11.09.1997 Original published format: US 928774 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902603 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902603 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | [1999/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902603 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/02, H05B6/36, H05B6/06 | [1999/42] | CPC: |
H05B6/104 (EP,KR,US);
H05B6/04 (EP,KR,US);
H05B6/365 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/11] | H05B6/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [2000/26] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Heizspulen-Vorrichtung mit Reihen-Stromversorgung für Streifenförmige Produkte | [2004/11] | English: | Strip heating coil apparatus with series power supplies | [1999/11] | French: | Bobine de chauffage pour des produits plats en acier avec alimentation en série | [1999/11] |
Former [1999/11] | Heispüle für Flachstahlprodukte mit Reihen-Strohmversorgung | Examination procedure | 28.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 13.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04077112.3 / EP1469706 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2004 | CH | 03.11.2004 | LI | 03.11.2004 | NL | 03.11.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/36] | AT | 03.11.2004 | |
CH | 03.11.2004 | ||
LI | 03.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 03.11.2004 | |
LI | 03.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2655590 (GOVAN GARDNER ROBERT PERCY); | [A]FR1504249 (AEG ELOTHERM GMBH); | [A]US3531612 (VIART Fernand [BE]); | [A]US4131813 (DELASSUS JEAN) |