EP0902606 - System and method for detecting nozzle and electrode wear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ESAB GROUP, INC. Post Office Box 100545, Ebenezer Road Florence South Carolina 29501-0545 / US | [2011/32] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states THE ESAB GROUP, INC. Post Office Box 100545, Ebenezer Road Florence, South Carolina 29501-0545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oakley, Thomas Franklin 2010 Rhodes Lane Florence, South Carolina / US | [1999/11] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307433.7 | 14.09.1998 | [1999/11] | Priority number, date | US19970929857 | 15.09.1997 Original published format: US 929857 | [1999/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0902606 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0902606 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | [2002/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0902606 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34 | [1999/11] | CPC: |
B23K10/006 (EP,US);
H05H1/3494 (EP,US);
H05H1/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2002/49] |
Former [1999/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichttung und Verfahren zur Detektion der Düse und Elektrodenabnutzung | [1999/11] | English: | System and method for detecting nozzle and electrode wear | [1999/11] | French: | Système et procédé pour la détection de l'usure de la buse et de l'électrode | [1999/11] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 21.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 10.08.2011 | IT | 10.08.2011 | NL | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | FR | 10.10.2011 | GB | 10.11.2011 | [2012/46] |
Former [2012/37] | BE | 10.08.2011 | |
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
FR | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 10.08.2011 | |
IT | 10.08.2011 | ||
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | BE | 10.08.2011 | |
NL | 10.08.2011 | ||
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | NL | 10.08.2011 | |
SE | 10.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 10.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9526251 (COMMW SCIENT IND RES ORG [AU], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 4 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 2 * * page 9, line 15 - line 27 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 11 * * page 12, line 4 - line 10 * * page 13, line 21 - page 14, line 9 * * page 16, line 25 - page 17, line 13 * [A] 2,5-7,9,10; | [A]EP0562111 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 45 * |