blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0904849

EP0904849 - Adhesive dispensing nozzles for producing partial spray patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/13]Adhesive dispensing nozzles for producing partial spray patterns and method
[2002/10]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  27.07.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/35]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview
Illinois 60025 / US
Former [1999/13]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kwok, Kui-Chiu
655 Woodhaven Drive
Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US
02 / Lessley, Mel S.
251 Farmington Drive
Lakeside Park, Kentucky 41017 / US
[1999/13]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Finnie, Peter John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [1999/13]Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date98307447.715.09.1998
[1999/13]
Priority number, dateUS1997094015829.09.1997         Original published format: US 940158
[1999/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0904849
Date:31.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0904849
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0904849
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0904849
Date:29.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B05C5/02
[1999/13]
CPC:
B05C5/027 (EP,US); B05B1/16 (KR); Y10T156/1798 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1999/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Klebstoffsdüsen zum Besprühen eines Substrats mit Klebstoff nach einem Muster[2002/10]
English:Adhesive dispensing nozzles for producing partial spray patterns[2002/10]
French:Buses de distribution d'adhésif pour pulvériser un adhésif sur un substrat suivant un motif[2002/10]
Former [1999/13]Verfahren und Klebstoffsdüsen zum Besprühen eines Substrats mit Klebstoff nach einem Muster
Former [1999/13]Adhesive dispensing nozzles for producing partial spray patterns and method
Former [1999/13]Procédé et buses de distribution d'adhésif pour pulvériser un adhésif sur un substrat suivant un motif
Examination procedure30.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
08.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.2002Fee for grant paid
26.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.08.2003  01.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Corporation
401 North Lake Street Neenah
Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2008/33]
Opponent(s)01  20.08.2003  01.09.2003  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Corporation
401 North Lake Street Neenah
Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2003/42]
Opponent(s)01  20.08.2003   
Kimberly-Clark Corporation
401 North Lake Street Neenah
Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Patent and Trade Mark Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
24.09.2003Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.12.2003Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
27.07.2004Reply to a communication from the opposition division
01.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2006Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.12.2006Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
02.01.2007Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.04.2007Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
11.07.2007Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
NL20.11.2002
[2003/39]
Former [2003/30]NL20.11.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US5145689  (ALLEN MARTIN A [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 9, line 38 - line 38 *;
 [A]US5305955  (SMITHERMAN JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 38 - line 40 * * column 3, line 25 - line 42 *;
 [A]US5618566  (ALLEN MARTIN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 63 - line 66 * * column 7, line 38 - line 48 *
ExaminationUS4889476
 US5421921
 US4380570
by applicantEP0872580
 US5421941
 EP0835952
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.