EP0905628 - Reducing cache misses by snarfing writebacks in non-inclusive memory systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2005 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haves, Norman M. 1121 Merrimac Drive Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US | 02 /
Hetherington, Ricky C. 997 Finovino court Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | 03 /
Kuttana, Belliappa M. 825 E Evelyn Avenue No. 314 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 04 /
Pong, Fong 150 Bryant Avenue Mountain View, California 94040 / US | 05 /
Thatipelli, Krishna M. 276 Sequim Common Fremont, California 94539 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [2008/35] |
Former [1999/13] | Hogg, Jeffery Keith, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307598.7 | 18.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | US19970940219 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: US 940219 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0905628 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0905628 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G06F12/0831 (EP,US);
G06F12/0811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2000/08] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Cachefehlgriffreduzierung durch Abhören von Rückschreiboperationen in Speichersystemen ohne die Einschluss-Eigenschaft | [1999/13] | English: | Reducing cache misses by snarfing writebacks in non-inclusive memory systems | [1999/13] | French: | Réduction de ratage d'antémémoire en fouinant et lisant des opérations de postmémorisation dans des systèmes de mémoire sans la propriété d'inclusion | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 01.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/41] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/41] | Request for further processing for: | 08.01.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.01.2004 | Decision despatched | 26.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.12.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5386547 (JOUPPI NORMAN P [US]) [X] 1,3,6,9,10,12,16,20,22 * column 2, line 1 - line 20 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 15; figure 2 *; | [A]US5581725 (NAKAYAMA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 2,6,9,11,16,20,22 * column 4, line 23 - line 30; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US5671391 (KNOTTS BRIAN W [US]) [A] 4,5,7-9,13-15,17-20* column 3, line 5 - line 28; figure 1 *; | [A] - "VERTICAL PARTITIONING IN CACHE HIERARCHIES", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198801), vol. 30, no. 8, page 33, XP002021670 [A] 1,6,9,10 * the whole document * |