EP0903421 - Ferritic heat-resistant steel and method for producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE FOR METALS 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE FOR METALS 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujitsuna, Nobuyuki c/o National Res. Inst. for Metals, 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Abe, Fujio c/o National Res. Inst. for Metals, 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 03 /
Itagaki, Takehiko c/o National Res. Inst. for Metals, 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 04 /
Igarashi, Masaaki c/o National Res. Inst. for Metals, 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 05 /
Muneki, Masakazu c/o National Res. Inst. for Metals, 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 06 /
Kimura, Kazuhiro c/o National Res. Inst. for Metals, 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 07 /
Kushima, Hideaki c/o National Res. Inst. for Metals, 1-2-1 Sengen Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | [1999/12] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/12] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307629.0 | 21.09.1998 | [1999/12] | Priority number, date | JP19970256479 | 22.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25647997 | JP19970256480 | 22.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25648097 | JP19970256481 | 22.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25648197 | [1999/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0903421 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0903421 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/22 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
C21D6/002 (EP,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C21D8/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
F28F19/06 (EP,US);
C21D1/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE [1999/51] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE | ||
Former [1999/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ferritischer,wärmebeständiger Stahl und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1999/12] | English: | Ferritic heat-resistant steel and method for producing it | [1999/12] | French: | Acier ferritique réfractaire et procédé de fabrication | [1999/12] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/38] | 25.09.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03007332.4 / EP1329531 | EP03007333.2 / EP1329532 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Request for further processing for: | 06.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3130179 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0384433 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0353047 ; | [A]JPH0633198 ; | [A]JPS6425915 ; | [A]EP0199046 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 3,8,11 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE2042394 (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 3,8,11 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]JPH04354855 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910521), vol. 15, no. 197, Database accession no. (C - 0833), & JP03053047 A 19910307 (NIPPON STEEL CORP.) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940513), vol. 18, no. 251, Database accession no. (C - 1199), & JP06033198 A 19940208 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP.) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890516), vol. 13, no. 208, Database accession no. (C - 596), & JP01025915 A 19890127 (POWER REACTOR & NUCLEAR FUEL DEV.CORP.) [A] 3,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930428), vol. 17, no. 216, Database accession no. (C - 1053), & JP04354855 A 19921209 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP.) [A] 11 * abstract * |