EP0907178 - Variable rate reading and writing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilton, Richard L. 3332 N. Lena Place Boise, Idaho 83713 / US | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1999/14] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307639.9 | 21.09.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | US19970943665 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: US 943665 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0907178 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0907178 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G06F3/06 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/0682 (EP);
G06F3/0613 (EP);
G06F3/0656 (EP);
G11B20/10527 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/31] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lesen und Schreiben mit variabler Rate | [1999/14] | English: | Variable rate reading and writing | [1999/14] | French: | Lecture et écriture à débit variable | [1999/14] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 25.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/38] | 03.09.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5513326 (QUANTUM CORPORATION) [DA] 1,8 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 67; figures 1,2 * |