EP0905814 - Transition between circuit transmission line and microwave waveguide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENDWAVE CORPORATION 321 Soquel Way Sunnyvale, CA 94086-4102 / US | [2001/02] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states ENDGATE CORPORATION 321 Soquel Way Sunnyvale, CA 94086-4102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanford, John R. 674 Florales Drive Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 02 /
Wilfong, James A. 2727 Victoria Manor San Carlos, California 94070 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307652.2 | 21.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | US19970937754 | 25.09.1997 Original published format: US 937754 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0905814 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0905814 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01P5/107 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
H01P5/107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/49] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Übergang zwischen Übertragungsleitung und Hohlleiter | [1999/13] | English: | Transition between circuit transmission line and microwave waveguide | [1999/13] | French: | Transition entre ligne de transmission et guide d' ondes | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 29.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9322802 (MARTIN MARIETTA CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 13; figure 1 * [A] 3,5,7,9; | [X]EP0632517 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - SIMONS R N ET AL, "NEW COPLANAR WAVEGUIDE TO RECTANGULAR WAVEGUIDE END LAUNCHER", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19920604), vol. 28, no. 12, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1138 - 1139, XP000304638 [A] 1,2 * page 1138, column R, line 23 - page 1139, column L, line 5; figure 1 * |