EP0905607 - Scrolling assisted by relevance indication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nielsen, Jakob 38 Walnut Street Atherton, California 94027 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307711.6 | 23.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | US19970941014 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: US 941014 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0905607 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0905607 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06F17/30 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/04855 (EP,US);
G06F16/338 (EP,US);
Y10S715/968 (US)
| Designated contracting states | [2000/20] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Informationsverschiebung mit Relevanzbezeichnungunterstützung | [1999/36] | English: | Scrolling assisted by relevance indication | [1999/13] | French: | Défilement d'information assisté par indication de relevance | [1999/13] |
Former [1999/13] | Informationsverschiebung mit Relevanzbezeichnungsunterstützung | Examination procedure | 09.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.04.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.04.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.04.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0459174 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,10,19 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 9; figures 3-5 * [A] 3,13; | [XA]EP0538166 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-5,19 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - line 56 * * column 3, line 25 - line 52 * * column 5, line 33 - column 7, line 8; figures 2-3C * * column 7, line 46 - line 56 * [A] 10-13; | [A]WO9315456 (COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]) [A] 4,5,12 * abstract * * page 6, line 8 - line 14; figures 5A-5C *; | [A]WO9621901 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 6-9,14-18,20 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 22 * * page 4, line 5 - line 15 * * page 5, line 5 - line 29 ** page 9, line 15 - page 14, line 15; figures 3-8 *; | [X]US5623588 (GOULD ERIC J [US]) [X] 1-5,10-13,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 12 * * column 4, line 39 - column 5, line 13; figures 5,6 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 28; figure 11 *; | [A]US5659732 (KIRSCH STEVEN T [US]) [A] 6-9,14-18,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 2, line 16 *; | [X] - "SHADING AS A FREQUENCY INDICATOR", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19940101), vol. 37, no. 1, page 527, XP000428872 [X] 1-5,10-13,19 * the whole document * |