EP0905640 - Delayed reset mode model for electronic identification systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.06.2003 [2003/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Data Investments Limited Akara Building, 24 De Castro Street, Wickhams Cay 1 Road Town Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Data Investments Limited Akara Building, 24 De Castro Street, Wickhams Cay 1 Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Turner, Christopher Gordon Gervase Rem. of 256 Hofmeyer Rd Pres. Park Agric. Holdings Halfway House, Gauteng / SA | 02 /
Kruger, Johan Dawid 11 Katdoring Way Fourways Gardens, Witkoppen Gauteng / SA | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | Whitten, George Alan, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307828.8 | 25.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | ZA19970008637 | 26.09.1997 Original published format: ZA 9708637 | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905640 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/08, G06K7/10, G06K7/00 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G06K7/10059 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06K7/10039 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/50] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Modell für verzögertes Rücksetzungsmodus in elektronischen Identifizierungssystemen | [1999/13] | English: | Delayed reset mode model for electronic identification systems | [1999/13] | French: | Modèle de mode de remise à zéro retardée pour des systèmes d'identification électronique | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/47] | 01.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 16.04.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.10.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.10.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0467036 (SAVI TECHN INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10* column 6, line 24 - column 8, line 11; figures 6-8 *; | [XA]EP0494114 (CSIR [ZA]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10 * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 5; figures 5-7 * [A] 3,6,9 |