EP0905673 - Active matrix display system and a method for driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TransPacific IP Ltd. 14 Fl., No. 168 Tun Hwa N. Road Taipei City / TW | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | [2008/48] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states TransPacific IP Ltd. 14 Fl., No. 168 Tun Hwa N. Road Taipei City / TW | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | |||
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states TransPacific IP Ltd. 14 Fl., No. 168 Tun Hwa N. Road Taipei City / TW | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | |||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08540-6449 / US | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | |||
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states Sarnoff Corporation 201 Washington Road, CN 5300 Princeton, NJ 08540-6449 / US | ||
For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 5-2 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kane, Michael Gillis 44 Robin Drive Skillman, NJ 08558 / US | 02 /
Atherton, James Harold 45 Everitts Road Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | 03 /
Stewart, Roger Green 3 Ski Drive Neshanic Station, NJ 08853 / US | 04 /
Cuomo, Frank Paul 74 Leavitt Lane Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer, et al Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer, et al Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/01] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer, et al Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/13] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307912.0 | 29.09.1998 | [1999/13] | Priority number, date | US19970060386P | 29.09.1997 Original published format: US 60386 P | US19970060387P | 29.09.1997 Original published format: US 60387 P | [1999/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905673 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905673 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32, G09G3/30 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
G09G3/3291 (EP,US);
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,US);
G09G2300/089 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0248 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0254 (EP,US);
G09G2310/027 (EP,US);
G09G2310/06 (EP,US);
G09G2310/061 (EP,US);
G09G2320/02 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0238 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0285 (EP,US);
G09G2320/029 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0295 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/50] |
Former [1999/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anzeigesystem mit aktiver Matrix und Steuerverfahren dafür | [1999/13] | English: | Active matrix display system and a method for driving the same | [1999/13] | French: | Système d'affichage à matrice active et sa méthode de commande | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT | 14.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 01.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 22.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2106299 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC [GB]) [A] 19,20* abstract *; | [A]EP0653741 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-8,18 * abstract * * column 7, line 14 - column 7, line 22 *; | [A]EP0731444 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [A] * abstract *; | [X]EP0755042 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [X] 19,20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0778556 (SARNOFF DAVID RES CENTER [US]) [A] 1,2,5-8,18 * abstract * |