EP0907228 - Gas laser, exposure apparatus and semiconductor device manufacturing method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/14] | Gas laser, exposure apparatus and device manufacturing method using the same | ||
[2002/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sano, Naoto, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nagai, Yoshiyuki, c/o Canon K.K. 30-2, 3-chome Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1999/14] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307966.6 | 30.09.1998 | [1999/14] | Priority number, date | JP19970271253 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: JP 27125397 | [1999/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0907228 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0907228 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/036 | [1999/14] | CPC: |
H01S3/036 (EP,US);
H01L21/027 (KR);
H01S3/2251 (EP);
H01S3/2256 (EP);
H01S3/2258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/51] |
Former [1999/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gaslaser, Belichtungsapparatur sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung von Halbleiterbauelementen unter Verwendung derselben | [2002/49] | English: | Gas laser, exposure apparatus and semiconductor device manufacturing method using the same | [2002/49] | French: | Laser à gaz, appareil d'exposition et procédé de fabrication de dispositif à semiconducteur en utilisant les mêmes | [2002/49] |
Former [1999/14] | Gaslaser, Beleuchtungsapparat sowie verfahren zur Herstellung von Geräten unter Verwendung derselben | ||
Former [1999/14] | Gas laser, exposure apparatus and device manufacturing method using the same | ||
Former [1999/14] | Laser à gaz, appareil d'exposition et procédé de fabrication de dispositif en utilisant les mêmes | Examination procedure | 30.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/43] | 13.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Request for further processing for: | 27.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01291477 ; | [A]WO9411932 (CYMER LASER TECH [US]) [A] 1,9,17 * page 11 - page 13; figures 1,7-9 *; | [A]EP0794598 (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900209), vol. 14, no. 73, Database accession no. (E - 887)<4016>, & JP01291477 A 19891124 (FANUC) [A] 1,9,17 * abstract * |