EP0908555 - System for monitoring dryer drum temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY 9 Trefoil Drive Trumbull Connecticut 06611-1330 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY 9 Trefoil Drive Trumbull, Connecticut 06611-1330 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farnsworth, David C. 1900 Hawaii Ave. NE St. Petersburg, Florida 33703 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307970.8 | 01.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | US19970943746 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: US 943746 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0908555 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0908555 | Date: | 02.02.2000 | [2000/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | D21F5/06, G01K13/08 | [2000/05] | CPC: |
D21G9/0036 (EP,US);
G01K7/02 (KR);
D21F5/06 (EP,US);
D21F7/12 (KR);
G01K1/024 (EP,KR);
G01K1/026 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/15] | D21F5/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/41] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System zur Überwachung der Temperatur von Trocknungszylindern | [1999/15] | English: | System for monitoring dryer drum temperatures | [1999/15] | French: | Système de surveillance de la température de rouleaux de séchage | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 03.08.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/36] | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3697726 (GERONIME ROBERT L) [A] 6,7,20,22 * column 2, line 58 - line 65; figure - *; | [X]US3878721 (NATH GUNTHER) [X] 1,13,15,27,29,30 * column A; figure - * * column 1, line 32 - line 36 * * column 4, line 38 - column 5, line 45 *; | [A]DE2428890 (NEUMUENSTER MASCH APP) [A] 1,15,29,30 * page 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US4089121 (SAWYER WILLARD C) [A] 11-13,25-27 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4518962 (IMOSE KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 3-5,8,17-19,21 * column 1, line 16 - column 2, line 35; figures 1,2 * * column 4, line 43 - line 63 *; | [A]US5456025 (JOINER JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 14,28* column A * |