EP0910004 - Method of generating a lookup table for a digital oscillator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD MOTOR COMPANY The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | For all designated states Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whikehart, J.William 24777 Sarah Flynn Drive Novi Michigan 48374 / US | 02 /
Ballard, Bradley Anderson 11531 Fisher Road Belleville Michigan 48111 / US | [1999/16] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/16] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98307988.0 | 30.09.1998 | [1999/16] | Priority number, date | US19970941958 | 01.10.1997 Original published format: US 941958 | [1999/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0910004 | Date: | 21.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0910004 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/03 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
G06F1/0328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2001/39] |
Former [1999/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen einer Nachschlagetabelle für einen digitalen Oszillator | [1999/16] | English: | Method of generating a lookup table for a digital oscillator | [1999/16] | French: | Procédé de génération d'une table de consultation pour un oscillateur numérique | [1999/16] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 22.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2308248 (HOLTEK MICROELECTRONICS INC [TW]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 3 - line 23 *; | [A]US5467294 (HU VINCE [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |