EP0911348 - Novel pour point depressants via anionic polymerization of (meth) acrylic monomers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION 330 South Fourth Street Richmond Virginia 23219-4304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states ETHYL CORPORATION 330 South Fourth Street Richmond, Virginia 23219-4304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mishra, Munmaya K. 11804 Summer Stream Drive Richmond, Virginia 23233 / US | 02 /
Saxton, Raymond G. 1030 Edgar Road Hanover, Virginia 23069 / US | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1999/17] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308203.3 | 08.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | US19970957046 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 957046 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911348 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911348 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/18, C10M145/14 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
C08F2/44 (KR);
C08F220/14 (KR);
C08F220/18 (KR);
C08F220/1804 (KR);
C08F220/1812 (KR);
C08F220/1818 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2000/51] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Stockpunkterniedrige Polymere durch Anionische Poymerisation von (Meth)acrylat Monomere | [1999/17] | English: | Novel pour point depressants via anionic polymerization of (meth) acrylic monomers | [1999/17] | French: | Agents abaissant le point d'écoulement obtenus par polymérisation anionique de monomères (meth)acrylates | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 13.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 14.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5368761 (GORE ROBERT H [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, line 13 - line 15 * * column 5, line 49 - line 55 * * examples 1-5,7,9-14,16,17,19 * * claim - *; | [YD]WO9623008 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [YD] 1-19 * abstract * * examples 4-15 *; | [A]US4756843 (JARRIN JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 33 - line 38 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 27 - line 30 * * examples 6-11 * * claim - *; | [A]EP0153209 (EMPRESA NAC PETROLEO [ES]) [A] 1-19 * example - *; | [A]DE3607444 (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-19 * example - *; | [A]FR2131111 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [A] 1-19 * examples 9,13 *; | [AD]US5534175 (CANTIANI ROBERT [FR]) [AD] 1-19 * example - * * claim 1 * |