EP0908600 - Formation testing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Change - withdrawal | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas Texas 75381-9052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Skinner, Neal G. 1219 Indian Paint Lewisville, Texas 75076 / US | [1999/15] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308218.1 | 08.10.1998 | [1999/15] | Priority number, date | US19970947805 | 09.10.1997 Original published format: US 947805 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0908600 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0908600 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/06, E21B47/18, E21B49/10, E21B49/08 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
E21B49/088 (EP);
E21B33/1243 (EP);
E21B47/06 (EP);
E21B47/18 (EP);
E21B49/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB, NL [2001/36] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung einer Formation | [1999/15] | English: | Formation testing apparatus | [1999/15] | French: | Dispositif pour l'essai de formations | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 06.12.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/06] | 09.01.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5644076 (CHIN WILSON C ET AL) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 36-60 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 19 * * column 8, lines 10-39 * * column 8, lines 60-65; figures 2-9 *; | [XY]US5130705 (ALLEN JAMES R ET AL) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 25-35; figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 15 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US4125163 (FITZPATRICK DOUG) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 20; figures 1,2,4-7 * * column 5, lines 8-39 *; | [X]US4893505 (MARSDEN MICHAEL J ET AL) [X] 1 * column 2, lines 3-10; figures 1,2,4,5 * * column 6, lines 45-65 *; | [X]US5473939 (LEDER JOHN L ET AL) [X] 1 * column 14, line 64 - column 15, line 5; figures 1-3 * * column 19, lines 14-30 * * column 21, lines 24-35; claim 2 *; | [Y]EP0697502 (SCHLUMBERGER SERVICES PETROL ;SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGY BV (NL); SCH) [Y] 7-10 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 11 *; | [A]US5166908 (MONTGOMERY MELVIN) [A] 1 * column 12, line 49 - column 13, line 5; figures 17,18 * | [XY] - MDT Modular Formation Dynamics Tester, HOUSTON, SCHLUMBERGER EDUCATIONAL SERVICES, (199211), XP002150355 [X] 1,6 * figures 7,11-13 * [Y] 7-10 | [A] - M. WANNELL, N. COLLEY, F. HALFORD, "The Use of a New Technique to Determine Permeability Anisotropy", SPE26801, Aberdeen, (19930907), pages 489 - 495, XP002150665 [A] 7-10 * the whole document * |