EP0911391 - A clone HWHHJ20 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albone, Earl Francis, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
Kikly, Kristine Kay, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2000/39] |
Former [1999/17] | 01 /
Albone, Earl Francis, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pa 19406 / US | ||
02 /
Kikly, Kristine Kay, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pa 19406 / US | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al FJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [1999/17] | Connell, Anthony Christopher SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308550.7 | 19.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | US19970063245P | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 63245 P | US19970123184P | 27.10.1997 Original published format: US 123184 P | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0911391 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0911391 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/12, C12N15/54, C12N1/21, C12N15/74, C07K16/40, A61K38/45, C12Q1/68, G01N33/68 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/39] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klon HWHHJ20 | [1999/17] | English: | A clone HWHHJ20 | [1999/17] | French: | Clone HWHHJ20 | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 17.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - REEVES R, SPIES GA, KIEFER M, BARR PJ, POWER M, "Primary structure of the putative human oncogene, pim-1.", GENE, AMSTERDAM NL, (19900615), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 303 - 307, XP002122335 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(90)90195-W |