EP0911531 - Rodless cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2001 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHD, Inc. 9009 Clubridge Drive Fort Wayne, IN 46809 / US | [1999/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamle, Michael E. 12097 North Haiwatha Drive Syracuse Indiana 46567 / US | [1999/17] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Rackham, Anthony Charles Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308580.4 | 20.10.1998 | [1999/17] | Priority number, date | US19970957061 | 24.10.1997 Original published format: US 957061 | [1999/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0911531 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/08 | [1999/17] | CPC: |
F15B15/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/02] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kolbenstangenloser Zylinder | [1999/17] | English: | Rodless cylinder | [1999/17] | French: | Cylindre sans tige | [1999/17] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 29.10.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 01.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/45] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.12.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5555789 (ROSENGREN GARY W [US], et al) [A] 1,4,8,18 * column 4, line 15 - line 39; figures 2B,3 *; | [A]EP0147803 (TOL O MATIC INC [US]) [A] 1,4,8,18 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2163499 (HERION WERKE KG) [A] 1,4,8,18 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4413512 (HYGRAMA AG [CH]) [A] 1,4,8,18 * figure 1 * |