blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0911234

EP0911234 - Dynamic vehicle control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/17]Vehicle dynamic control system
[2005/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1999/17]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsuno, Koji
c/o Subaru Laboratory, 9-6, Osawa 3-chome
Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Matsuura, Munenori
c/o Subaru Laboratory, 9-6, Osawa 3-chome
Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP
03 / Konno, Toshihiro
c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K., 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP
04 / Takahashi, Akira
c/o Subaru Laboratory, 9-6, Osawa 3-chome
Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP
05 / Mine, Atsushi
c/o Subaru Laboratory, 9-6, Osawa 3-chome
Mitaka-shi, Tokyo / JP
[1999/17]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Former [1999/17]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date98308597.821.10.1998
[1999/17]
Priority number, dateJP1997028878521.10.1997         Original published format: JP 28878597
[1999/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0911234
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0911234
Date:26.01.2000
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0911234
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:B60T8/00
[1999/17]
CPC:
B60T8/1755 (EP,US); B60T2201/14 (EP,US); B60T2201/16 (EP,US);
B60T2210/24 (EP,US); B60T2210/36 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/40]
Former [1999/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftfahrzeugdynamik- Steuersystem[1999/17]
English:Dynamic vehicle control system[2005/46]
French:Système de commande de la dynamique d'un véhicule[1999/17]
Former [1999/17]Vehicle dynamic control system
Examination procedure17.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
27.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2006Fee for grant paid
14.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB21.10.2006
[2008/15]
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE4333961  (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 10 - line 14 * * column 10, line 4 - line 50 * * figures 11,12 *;
 [Y]US5301768  (ISHIKAWA WATARU [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 22 * * column 5, line 49 - line 54 ** column 8, line 17 - line 22 *;
 [XY]US5315295  (FUJII YUTAKA [JP]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 7; figures 1,4 * [Y] 5,6
by applicantJPH0270561
 JPH0976894
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.