EP0913137 - Disposable diaper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Seiji, Research & Development Division 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kanagawa-ken, 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
Soga, Hiroyuki, Research & Development Division 1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kanagawa-ken, 769-1602 / JP | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Parry, Christopher Stephen Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Herts. WD1 7HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98308836.0 | 28.10.1998 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | JP19970300856 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: JP 30085697 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0913137 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0913137 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0913137 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
A61F13/4942 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2001/22] |
Former [1999/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wegwerfwindel | [1999/18] | English: | Disposable diaper | [1999/18] | French: | Couche-culotte à jeter | [1999/18] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 28.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02174845 ; | [A]US4753646 (ENLOE KENNETH M [US]) [A] 1* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5593401 (SOSALLA PAULA M [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 23; figures 4,6 *; | [A]US5672166 (VANDEMOORTELE PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 52 - line 67; figure -; claim 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900921), vol. 014, no. 443, Database accession no. (C - 0762), & JP02174845 A 19900706 (DAIO PAPER CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |